Jousma v. Vacation Resorts International et al

Plaintiff: James Jousma
Defendant: the Law Offices of Clark J. Duellman, Vacation Resorts International, Clark J. Duellman, personally, The Law Office of Clark J. Duellman and Clark J. Duellman
Case Number: 1:2018cv01276
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Robert J Jonker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by James Jousma as to Vacation Resorts International waiver sent on 12/7/2018, answer due 2/5/2019 (Parker, Brian)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Clark J. Duellman, The Law Office of Clark J. Duellman, Vacation Resorts International (ems)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (ems)
November 13, 2018 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff James Jousma in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4290341 (Parker, Brian)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Clark J. Duellman, Vacation Resorts International, The Law Office of Clark J. Duellman filed by James Jousma (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-6, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons VRI, #4 Summons Law Office of Duellman, #5 Summons Duellman personally) (Parker, Brian) Modified text on 11/14/2018 (jlg) Modified text on 11/14/2018 (ems).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jousma v. Vacation Resorts International et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Jousma
Represented By: Brian P. Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: the Law Offices of Clark J. Duellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vacation Resorts International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark J. Duellman, personally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Law Office of Clark J. Duellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark J. Duellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?