Kihn v. Ionia County Sheriff's Department et al
Plaintiff: Bradley Edward Kihn
Defendant: Ionia County Sheriff's Department, Kyle Butler, Department of Health and Human Services, Ionia County Prosecutor's Office, Star Thomas, Sonya Kihn, Brittany Ramsey, Lindsey Leak, Susan Ward, Linda Kimmel, Portland Police Department, Journeys of Life Counseling Center, LLC, Brent Denny, Cheryl Pinnow, Katelynn Harper, Ionia Montcalm Secure and Friendly Environment Center, Phillip Hesche, Lori Kirkhoff and Ionia Montcalm Secure and Friendly Environment Child Advocacy Center
Case Number: 1:2018cv01291
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting STIPULATION #6 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Time to Answer Complaint by defendants Kyle Butler, Brent Denny, Phillip Hesche, Ionia County Prosecutor's Office, Ionia County Sheriff's Department, Lori Kirkhoff, Cheryl Pinnow [Attorney Allan C. Vander Laan added to party Kyle Butler(pty:dft), Attorney Allan C. Vander Laan added to party Brent Denny(pty:dft), Attorney Allan C. Vander Laan added to party Phillip Hesche(pty:dft), Attorney Allan C. Vander Laan added to party Ionia County Prosecutor's Office(pty:dft), Attorney Allan C. Vander Laan added to party Ionia County Sheriff's Department(pty:dft), Attorney Allan C. Vander Laan added to party Lori Kirkhoff(pty:dft), Attorney Allan C. Vander Laan added to party Cheryl Pinnow(pty:dft)] (Vander Laan, Allan)
January 9, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Kristin M. Heyse on behalf of defendants Department of Health and Human Services, Katelynn Harper, Lindsey Leak, Brittany Ramsey (Heyse, Kristin)
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 REDACTED AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Bradley Edward Kihn (O'Keefe, Patrick)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #1 ; Clerk of Court is ordered to place complaint #1 under seal; Plaintiff shall file a redacted complaint not later than 12/4/2018 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Kyle Butler, Brent Denny, Department of Health and Human Services, Katelynn Harper, Phillip Hesche, Ionia County Prosecutor's Office, Ionia County Sheriff's Department, Ionia Montcalm Secure and Friendly Environment Child Advocacy Center, Journeys of Life Counseling Center, LLC, Sonya Kihn, Linda Kimmel, Lori Kirkhoff, Lindsey Leak, Cheryl Pinnow, Portland Police Department, Brittany Ramsey, Star Thomas, Susan Ward (ems)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (ems)
November 16, 2018 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Bradley Edward Kihn in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4294035 (O'Keefe, Patrick)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 SEALED COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Bradley Edward Kihn (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document Summons, #2 Proposed Document Summons, #3 Proposed Document Summons, #4 Proposed Document Summons, #5 Proposed Document Summons, #6 Proposed Document Summons, #7 Proposed Document Summons, #8 Proposed Document Summons, #9 Proposed Document Summons, #10 Proposed Document Summons, #11 Proposed Document Summons, #12 Proposed Document Summons, #13 Proposed Document Summons, #14 Proposed Document Summons, #15 Proposed Document Summons, #16 Proposed Document Summons, #17 Proposed Document Summons, #18 Proposed Document Summons) (O'Keefe, Patrick) Modified security per order #4 on 11/21/2018 (jlb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kihn v. Ionia County Sheriff's Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ionia County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Butler
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Kristin M. Heyse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ionia County Prosecutor's Office
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Star Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonya Kihn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittany Ramsey
Represented By: Kristin M. Heyse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsey Leak
Represented By: Kristin M. Heyse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Kimmel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portland Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Journeys of Life Counseling Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Denny
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Pinnow
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katelynn Harper
Represented By: Kristin M. Heyse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ionia Montcalm Secure and Friendly Environment Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Hesche
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Kirkhoff
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ionia Montcalm Secure and Friendly Environment Child Advocacy Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Edward Kihn
Represented By: Patrick William O'Keefe, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?