Aldaoud v. Department of Homeland Security

Petitioner: Jimmy Aldaoud
Respondent: Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 1:2018cv01298
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Certified Copy of Order on Motion to Dismiss #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Jimmy Aldaoud, A023659820, Northeast Ohio Correctional Center, 2240 Hubbard Road, Youngstown, OH 44505 (clw)
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 LETTER from Jimmy Aldaoud re habeas corpus case filed in EDMI and dismissing this case (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (clw)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of voluntary dismissal re #4 ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
December 10, 2018 Filing 9 LETTER from Jimmy Aldaoud regarding #4 , #6 (ns)
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 LETTER from Jimmy Aldaoud regarding #4 , #6 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ns)
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to dismiss by petitioner Jimmy Aldaoud; (clw)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to dismiss by petitioner Jimmy Aldaoud; (clw)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 LETTER from Jimmy Aldaoud re refiling habeas form using the correct filing methods (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (clw)
November 28, 2018 Copy of Deficiency Order #2 sent via U.S. Mail to Jimmy Aldaoud, A023659820, Northeast Ohio Correctional Center, 2240 Hubbard Road, Youngstown, OH 44505 (clw)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DEFICIENCY ORDER: petitioner has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 12/25/2018 or the action will be dismissed filing fee to be submitted by 12/25/2018; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Jimmy Aldaoud (clw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aldaoud v. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jimmy Aldaoud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?