Moy #187335 v. Burt

Petitioner: Steven Lee Moy #187335
Respondent: Sherry L. Burt
Case Number: 1:2018cv01425
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT re #9 by petitioner Steven Lee Moy #187335 (ns)
January 11, 2019 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT re Prisoner Financial Documents (Cure Deficiency) #5 by petitioner Steven Lee Moy #187335 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (ns)
January 10, 2019 Copy of Order to Proceed IFP (Habeas) #8 sent via U.S. Mail to Steven Lee Moy #187335 (ns)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting petitioner leave to proceed in forma pauperis in a habeas action; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, ald)
January 7, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEF in support of MOTION for order named as "Motion for Equitable Tolling" #6 filed by Steven Lee Moy #187335 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ns)
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for order named as "Motion for Equitable Tolling" by petitioner Steven Lee Moy #187335; (ns)
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 PRISONER FINANCIAL DOCUMENT(S) (cure deficiency): Certificate of Prisoner Institutional/Trust Fund Account Activity submitted by plaintiff Steven Lee Moy #187335 to cure deficiency (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (ns)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Steven Lee Moy #187335 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ns)
December 27, 2018 Copy of Deficiency Order, #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Steven Lee Moy #187335 (ns)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DEFICIENCY ORDER: petitioner has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis;deficiency to be cured by 1/24/2019 or the action will be dismissed filing fee to be submitted by 1/24/2019; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 BRIEF by petitioner Steven Lee Moy #187335 re #1 (ns)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Steven Lee Moy #187335 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (ns)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moy #187335 v. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sherry L. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven Lee Moy #187335
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?