Wohadlo v. Tentcraft, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marie Wohadlo
Defendant: Matt Bulloch, Zach Grice, Josh Scott, Rob Hanel and Tentcraft, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01442
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint; response due 3/4/2019; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal)
February 21, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 #14 filed by Matt Bulloch, Zach Grice, Rob Hanel, Josh Scott, Tentcraft, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Chain) (Butler, Kay)
February 21, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 by defendants Matt Bulloch, Zach Grice, Rob Hanel, Josh Scott, Tentcraft, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Chain, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order) (Butler, Kay)
February 21, 2019 Copy of Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, #13 sent via U.S. Mail to Marie Wohadlo (mg)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 3/22/2019 at 02:00 PM at 650 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody; status report due by 3/19/2019; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal)
February 20, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Kay Rivest Butler on behalf of defendants Matt Bulloch, Zach Grice, Rob Hanel, Josh Scott, Tentcraft, Inc. (Butler, Kay)
February 13, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS returned executed by US Marshal by mail with acknowledgment of receipt of summons and complaint by Mat Nicholson for Tentcraft, Inc. served on 2/4/2019, answer due 2/25/2019 (mg)
February 11, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed by US Marshal by mail with acknowledgment of receipt of summons and complaint by Mat Nicholson for Zach Grice served on 2/4/2019, answer due 2/25/2019 (mg)
February 11, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed by US Marshal by mail with acknowledgment of receipt of summons and complaint by Mat Nicholson for Rob Hanel served on 2/4/2019, answer due 2/25/2019 (mg)
February 11, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed by US Marshal by mail with acknowledgment of receipt of summons and complaint by Mat Nicholson for Matt Bulloch served on 2/4/2019, answer due 2/25/2019 (mg)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed by US Marshal by mail with acknowledgment of receipt of summons and complaint by Mat Nicholson for Josh Scott served on 2/4/2019, answer due 2/25/2019 (mg)
January 8, 2019 PRO SE PLAINTIFF REGISTERED TO E-FILE; Copy of Pro Se Application for Electronic Filing and Service #3 complete with login and password sent sent via U.S. Mail to Marie Wohadlo (lep)
January 3, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Matt Bulloch, Zach Grice, Rob Hanel, Josh Scott, Tentcraft, Inc. and delivered to US Marshal for service (mg)
January 2, 2019 Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Marie Wohadlo (mg)
December 31, 2018 Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #5 , Order on Motion for Leave to File and Receive Notice Electronically #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Marie Wohadlo (jlb)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 plaintiff's motion for leave to file and receive notice electronically; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, cbh)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING PRO SE MOTION for leave to file and receive service electronically #3 to Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
December 28, 2018 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Marie Wohadlo (pjw)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of receipt of case (pjw)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 PRO SE MOTION for leave to file and receive service electronically by plaintiff Marie Wohadlo; (pjw)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (pjw)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Marie Wohadlo (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summonses) (pjw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wohadlo v. Tentcraft, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Bulloch
Represented By: Kay Rivest Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zach Grice
Represented By: Kay Rivest Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Scott
Represented By: Kay Rivest Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Hanel
Represented By: Kay Rivest Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tentcraft, Inc.
Represented By: Kay Rivest Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Wohadlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?