Martin v. Pratt Recycling, Inc.
Plaintiff: Annie Padilla Martin
Defendant: Pratt Recycling, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00013
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE re #1 Of Limited Appearance by defendant Pratt Recycling, Inc. (Gross, Sharon)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 RETURNED MAIL: Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #2 that was sent via U.S. Mail to Annie Padilla Martin returned to the Court marked Not Deliverable as Addressed; Unable to Forward (mlc)
January 11, 2019 Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Annie Padilla Martin (pjw)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ray Kent for handling of all matters under 636(a) and 636(b)(1)(A) and for submission of recommendations on dispositive motions under 636(b)(1)(B); signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
January 9, 2019 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #2 sent via U.S. Mail to Annie Padilla Martin (pjw)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of receipt of case (pjw)
January 8, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Pratt Recycling, Inc. and returned to plaintff at county in Kalamazoo Clerk's Office (pjw) Modified text on 1/9/2019 (pjw).
January 8, 2019 RECEIPT: in the amount of $400.00, receipt number KZ003705; for filing fee (pjw)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Pratt Recycling, Inc. filed by Annie Padilla Martin (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (pjw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Pratt Recycling, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Padilla Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pratt Recycling, Inc.
Represented By: Sharon Rae Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?