Lynn v. Lansing, City of
Plaintiff: Michael Lynn
Defendant: City of Lansing and Lansing, City of
Case Number: 1:2019cv00039
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 4/11/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; status report due by 4/8/2019; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw)
March 12, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #5 with affirmative defenses and Jury Reliance by Lansing, City of (Stowers, Rhonda)
February 21, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Rhonda Stowers on behalf of defendant Lansing, City of (Stowers, Rhonda)
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lansing, City of filed by Michael Lynn (Batey, Scott)
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Lansing, City of (mg)
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Batey, Scott)
January 23, 2019 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant Lansing, City of (none provided) (mg)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (mg)
January 18, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Michael Lynn in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4342723 (Batey, Scott)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against City of Lansing filed by Michael Lynn (Batey, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lynn v. Lansing, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Lansing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lansing, City of
Represented By: Rhonda Stowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lynn
Represented By: Scott Preston Batey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?