Orrick #436766 v. Trierweiler

Petitioner: Billy Orrick #436766
Respondent: Tony Trierweiler
Case Number: 1:2019cv00056
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER FROM CCA regarding appeal #6 indicating appeal has been docketed as USCA case number 19-1240 (ems)
March 13, 2019 CASE NUMBER 19-1240 assigned by the Sixth Circuit to appeal #6 (mkc)
March 13, 2019 Copy of Order to Proceed IFP on Appeal - Habeas #8 sent via U.S. Mail to Billy Orrick #436766 (ems)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS ON APPEAL: petitioner may proceed in forma pauperis without payment of an appeal fee; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw)
March 8, 2019 Copy of Notice of Appeal #6 and docket sheet sent via U.S. Mail to Billy Orrick #436766 (ems)
March 7, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (ems)
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL re #4 , #5 , #3 by petitioner Billy Orrick #436766 (ems)
February 21, 2019 Certified Copy of Order Denying Certificate of Appealability #4 , Judgment Dismissing Habeas Action Under Rule 4 #5 , Opinion (Screening) #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Billy Orrick #436766 (ems)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 JUDGMENT dismissing habeas action under Rule 4 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying Petitioner's motion to stay #2 ; denying certificate of appealability ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 OPINION ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to stay re #1 by petitioner Billy Orrick #436766; (ems)
January 22, 2019 RECEIPT: filing fee in the amount of $5.00, receipt number GR064409 (ems)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Billy Orrick #436766 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ems)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orrick #436766 v. Trierweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tony Trierweiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Billy Orrick #436766
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?