McKinney #872175 v. Burt
Petitioner: Billie D. McKinney and Billie D. McKinney #872175
Respondent: Sherry L. Burt and S. L. Burt
Case Number: 1:2019cv00076
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Robert J Jonker
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 7 JUDGMENT dismissing habeas action under Rule 4 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying certificate of appealability ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
March 15, 2019 Filing 5 OPINION ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to attorney Mary A. Owens regarding recent filing #3 (ems)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 EXHIBIT 5-9 to Petition for Habeas Corpus by petitioner Billie D. McKinney #872175 (Owens, Mary)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker and Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (ems)
February 1, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by petitioner Billie D. McKinney #872175 in the amount of $5, receipt number 0646-4352985 (Owens, Mary) Modified text on 2/4/2019 (ems).
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 FIRST PETITION for writ of habeas corpus (with Index of Attachments and Exhibits and Exhibits 1-4) filed by Billie D. McKinney #872175 (Attachments: #1 Index of Attachments and Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1-2, #3 Exhibit 3-4) (Owens, Mary) Modified text on 2/4/2019 (ems). Modified text on 2/15/2019 (ems).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKinney #872175 v. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sherry L. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: S. L. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Billie D. McKinney
Represented By: Mary A. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Billie D. McKinney #872175
Represented By: Mary A. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?