Andrews v. Grand Pines Assisted Living LLC

Plaintiff: Henrietta Andrews
Defendant: Grand Pines Assisted Living LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00101
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
0 Judge: Ray Kent
1 Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Grand Pines Assisted Living LLC (Meyer, Brett)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION AND ORDER; deadline for defendant to respond to complaint extended to 4/4/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by defendant Grand Pines Assisted Living LLC (Meyer, Brett)
March 22, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Brett Thomas Meyer on behalf of defendant Grand Pines Assisted Living LLC (Meyer, Brett)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Grand Pines Assisted Living LLC (ems)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ems)
February 7, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Henrietta Andrews in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4357959 (Marco, David)
February 7, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Larry P. Smith on behalf of plaintiff Henrietta Andrews (Smith, Larry)
February 7, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of David Michael Marco on behalf of plaintiff Henrietta Andrews (Marco, David)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Grand Pines Assisted Living LLC filed by Henrietta Andrews (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Marco, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrews v. Grand Pines Assisted Living LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henrietta Andrews
Represented By: Larry P. Smith
Represented By: David Michael Marco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Pines Assisted Living LLC
Represented By: Brett Thomas Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?