Rhone v. East Lansing OPCO, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Tamehrah Rhone
Defendant: East Lansing OPCO, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00109
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER rescheduling Rule 16 conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is rescheduled to 5/2/2019 at 10:00 AM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; joint status report due by 4/25/2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 4/24/2019 at 01:30 PM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; joint status report due by 4/17/2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
March 20, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #5 with affirmative defenses and Reliance on Jury Demand by East Lansing OPCO, L.L.C. (Stuebing, Julia)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against East Lansing OPCO, L.L.C. filed by Tamehrah Rhone (Batey, Scott)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant East Lansing OPCO, L.L.C. (mg)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Batey, Scott)
February 13, 2019 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant East Lansing OPCO, L.L.C. (none provided) (mg)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (mg)
February 11, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Tamehrah Rhone in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4359325 (Batey, Scott)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against East Lansing OPCO, L.L.C. filed by Tamehrah Rhone (Batey, Scott) Modified text on 2/11/2019 (jlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhone v. East Lansing OPCO, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Lansing OPCO, L.L.C.
Represented By: Julia Tasse Stuebing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamehrah Rhone
Represented By: Scott Preston Batey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?