Bender v. Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dylan A. Bender
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00137
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER regarding preparation of joint status report: status report due by 5/15/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Midland Credit Management, Inc. (Lintemuth, Elisa)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to complaint #1 with reliance on jury demand and affirmative defenses by Midland Credit Management, Inc. (Lintemuth, Elisa) Modified text on 4/17/2019 (pjw).
April 16, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Elisa Jean Lintemuth on behalf of defendant Midland Credit Management, Inc. (Lintemuth, Elisa)
March 29, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; Midland Credit Management, Inc. served on 3/26/2019, answer due 4/16/2019 (Volheim, Nathan)
March 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Midland Credit Management, Inc. (pjw)
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Volheim, Nathan)
February 26, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Dylan A. Bender in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4371856 (Volheim, Nathan)
February 26, 2019 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant Midland Credit Management, Inc. (none provided and fee due) (pjw)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee (pjw)
February 22, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Eric Donald Coleman on behalf of plaintiff Dylan A. Bender (Coleman, Eric)
February 22, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Nathan Charles Volheim on behalf of plaintiff Dylan A. Bender (Volheim, Nathan)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Midland Credit Management, Inc. filed by Dylan A. Bender (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Volheim, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bender v. Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylan A. Bender
Represented By: Eric Donald Coleman
Represented By: Nathan Charles Volheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Represented By: Elisa Jean Lintemuth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?