Howland #178044 v. MaCauley

Petitioner: Jody Alan Howland #178044
Respondent: Matt MaCauley
Case Number: 1:2019cv00143
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Copy of Order to Proceed IFP (Habeas) #8 sent via U.S. Mail to Jody Alan Howland #178044 (pjw)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting petitioner leave to proceed in forma pauperis in a habeas action; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw)
March 20, 2019 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE by petitioner Jody Alan Howland #178044 re Prisoner Financial Documents (Cure Deficiency) #6 (pjw)
March 20, 2019 Filing 6 PRISONER FINANCIAL DOCUMENT(S) (cure deficiency): application to proceed informa pauperis and certificate of trust fund account activity and trust account statement submitted by plaintiff Jody Alan Howland #178044 to cure deficiency (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (pjw); Modified text on 3/22/2019 (pjw).
March 1, 2019 Copy of Deficiency Order #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Jody Alan Howland #178044 (pjw)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DEFICIENCY ORDER: petitioner has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 3/29/2019 or the action will be dismissed; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by petitioner Jody Alan Howland #178044 re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #2 , APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit #3 (pjw)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (signature taken from Doc #1 ) (pjw); Modified text on 2/28/2019 (pjw).
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Jody Alan Howland #178044 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (pjw)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for extension of time to file habeas petition by petitioner Jody Alan Howland #178044; (pjw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howland #178044 v. MaCauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jody Alan Howland #178044
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matt MaCauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?