Beamon #672483 v. Jackson

Petitioner: Edward Minaskar Beamon #672483
Respondent: Shane Jackson
Case Number: 1:2019cv00144
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE by certified mail upon Attorney General 4/1/2019 (clw)
March 28, 2019 Copy of Order to Answer (Habeas), #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Edward Minaskar Beamon #672483 (clw)
March 28, 2019 SERVICE by CERTIFIED MAIL in a habeas action: copy of habeas petition and order to answer sent by certified mail, article number 7012 1010 0001 4160 8736 as to the Attorney General; Respondent Shane Jackson served via regular mail (clw)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO FILE ANSWER OR OTHER PLEADING: the Clerk to serve a copy of the petition and brief by regular mail on the respondent and one copy by certified mail on the Attorney General of the State of MI; respondent to answer the habeas petition within 180 days; no extensions will be granted; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw)
March 5, 2019 Copy of Order to Proceed IFP (Habeas) #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Edward Minaskar Beamon #672483 (clw)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting petitioner leave to proceed in forma pauperis in a habeas action; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (clw)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Edward Minaskar Beamon #672483 (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Memorandum of Law in Support) (clw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beamon #672483 v. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Shane Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Edward Minaskar Beamon #672483
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?