Knapp v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Jacqueline C. Knapp
Defendant: Michigan, State of, William P. Barr, United States of America and Dana Nessel
Petitioner: Marguerite Martin, CoraLou Harris, Jaime Hull, Melissa J. Bazzy, Rodney LaPlat, Peter M. Drea, Julie A. Drea, Rhonda T. Favero, Lawrence L. Favero, Pamela Molnar, Saundra J. Wilson, Douglas Leigh Hughes, Jesse P. Ray, John Hull, Julie Fisher, Wayne K. Wilson and Karen Diann Davis Hughes
Case Number: 1:2019cv00146
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for joinder by movant Wayne K. Wilson; (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ems)
April 15, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for joinder by movant Julie Fisher; (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ems)
April 15, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION for joinder by movant CoraLou Harris; (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ems)
April 15, 2019 Copy of Order on Motion for Extension of Time, Order on Proposed Order #35 sent via U.S. Mail to Jacqueline C. Knapp, Rhonda T. Favero, Lawrence L. Favero, Douglas Leigh Hughes, Karen Diann Davis Hughes, Julie A. Drea, Peter M. Drea, Melissa J. Bazzy, Saundra J. Wilson, Pamela Molnar, Jesse P. Ray, Jaime Hill, John Hull, Rodney LaPlat, Marguerite Martin (ems)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #31 motion for extension of time and accepting PROPOSED ORDER #34 : The time for Defendants State of Michigan and Attorney General Nessel to respond to the complaint is extended until 5/20/2019; the time to respond to each of the motions to join is extended until 5/20/2019; and the time to respond to any future motion to join filed in this matter is extended until 5/20/2019 or fourteen (14) days after the motion to join is filed, whichever date is later; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, cbh)
April 12, 2019 Filing 34 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Granting Motion for Extention to File Response by defendants Michigan, State of, Dana Nessel (Ho, Joseph)
April 12, 2019 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for extension of time to file response #31 (with Certificate of Service) filed by Michigan, State of, Dana Nessel (Ho, Joseph) Modified text on 4/15/2019 (ems).
April 12, 2019 Filing 32 BRIEF in support of MOTION for extension of time to file response #31 (with Certificate of Service) filed by Michigan, State of, Dana Nessel (Ho, Joseph) Modified text on 4/15/2019 (ems).
April 12, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for extension of time to file response (with Certificate of Service) by defendants Michigan, State of, Dana Nessel; (Ho, Joseph) Modified text on 4/15/2019 (ems).
April 11, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Joseph Ho on behalf of defendants Michigan, State of, Dana Nessel (Ho, Joseph)
April 9, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for joinder by movant Rodney LaPlat; (ems)
April 9, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for joinder by movant John Hull; (ems)
April 9, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for joinder by movant Jaime Hull; (ems)
April 8, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for joinder by movant Marguerite Martin; (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ems)
April 4, 2019 Filing 26 PROOF OF SERVICE for Process Receipt and Return of summons and complaint upon William P. Barr, U.S. Attorney General on 3/27/19 (ems)
April 4, 2019 Filing 25 PROOF OF SERVICE for Process Receipt and Return of summons and complaint upon Office of the Attorney General on 3/26/19 (ems) Modified text on 4/9/2019 (ems).
April 4, 2019 Copy of Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,, #23 sent via U.S. Mail to Jesse P. Ray (ns)
April 3, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for joinder by movant Jesse P. Ray; (ns)
April 3, 2019 Copy of Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, #23 sent via U.S. Mail to Jacqueline C. Knapp, Rhonda T. Favero, Lawrence L. Favero, Douglas Leigh Hughes, Karen Diann Davis Hughes, Julie A. Drea, Peter M. Drea, Melissa J. Bazzy, Saundra J. Wilson, and Pamela Molnar (ns)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #16 Defendant United States of America's Motion for an Extension of Time; the time for the United States to respond to each of theMotions to Join #7 #8 #9 #10 #11 #12 #13 #14 is extended until 5/20/2019, and the time for the United Statesto respond to any future Motion to Join filed in this matter is extended until 5/20/2019 or 14 days after the Motion to Join is filed, whichever date is later; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, cbh)
April 1, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for joinder by movant Pamela Molnar; (ems)
April 1, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants William P. Barr, United States of America re Certificate Regarding Motion Concurrence, #18 , Memorandum in Support of a Motion #17 , MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply re #14 , #13 , #7 , #8 , #9 , #10 , #11 , #12 #16 (Babinsky, Laura)
April 1, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply re #14 , #13 , #7 , #8 , #9 , #10 , #11 , #12 #16 filed by William P. Barr, United States of America (Babinsky, Laura)
April 1, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in support of Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #16 filed by William P. Barr, United States of America (Babinsky, Laura)
April 1, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply re #14 , #13 , #7 , #8 , #9 , #10 , #11 , #12 by defendants William P. Barr, United States of America; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Babinsky, Laura)
March 29, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS returned executed by US Marshal by mail with acknowledgment of receipt of summons and complaint by Jeff Bailey for Dana Nessel served on 3/25/2019, answer due 4/15/2019 (ems)
March 29, 2019 Filing 20 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of William P. Barr served on 3/20/2019, answer due 5/20/2019; United States of America served on 3/20/2019, answer due 5/20/2019 (ems)
March 28, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS returned executed by US Marshal by mail with acknowledgment of receipt of summons and complaint by Jeff Bailey for Michigan, State of served on 3/22/2019, answer due 4/12/2019 (ems)
March 25, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for joinder by movant Saundra J. Wilson; (ems)
March 14, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to William P. Barr, Michigan, State of, Dana Nessel, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and delivered to US Marshal for service (ems)
March 13, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for joinder by movant Melissa J. Bazzy; (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ems)
March 11, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for joinder by movant Peter M. Drea; (ems)
March 11, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for joinder by movant Julie A. Drea; (ems)
March 7, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for joinder by movant Karen Diann Davis Hughes; (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ems)
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for joinder by movant Douglas Leigh Hughes; (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ems)
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for joinder by movant Lawrence L. Favero; (ems)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for joinder by movant Rhonda T. Favero; (ems)
February 28, 2019 Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #6 , Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Jacqueline C. Knapp (ems)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
February 27, 2019 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Jacqueline C. Knapp (ems)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of receipt of case (ems)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (ems)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (ems)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William P. Barr, Michigan, State of, Dana Nessel, United States of America filed by Jacqueline C. Knapp (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ems)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knapp v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline C. Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan, State of
Represented By: Joseph Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Barr
Represented By: Laura Ann Babinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Laura Ann Babinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Nessel
Represented By: Joseph Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marguerite Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CoraLou Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jaime Hull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Melissa J. Bazzy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rodney LaPlat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Peter M. Drea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Julie A. Drea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rhonda T. Favero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lawrence L. Favero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pamela Molnar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Saundra J. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Douglas Leigh Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jesse P. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Hull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Julie Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wayne K. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Karen Diann Davis Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?