Smith v. Kellogg Community College

Plaintiff: Carrie Smith
Defendant: Kellogg Community College
Case Number: 1:2019cv00152
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL #9 ; the case is closed ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
April 17, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Dismissal by defendant Kellogg Community College (Koss, Ryan)
April 5, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Joseph Abraham Starr on behalf of defendant Kellogg Community College (Starr, Joseph)
April 5, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Kellogg Community College (Koss, Ryan)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting PROPOSED ORDER #6 extending time to answer ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
March 13, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by defendant Kellogg Community College (Koss, Ryan)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 4/23/2019 at 04:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 4/16/2019 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Carrie Smith (Kreter, Mark)
February 28, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kellogg Community College (Koss, Ryan)
February 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (mg)
February 27, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant Kellogg Community College in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4373565 (Koss, Ryan)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Calhoun County Circuit Court case number 19-391-CZ filed by Kellogg Community College (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -State Court Documents - Summons, Complaint, Motion for ex parte temporary restraining order, show cause, preliminary injunction, and for expedited discovery, Brief in support of tro, Exhibits to Complaint (Exhibit A- Medical information, Exhibit B- Affidavit Dr. Helgerson, Exhibit C-Letter to students, Exhibit D-Policies, Exhibit E-FOIA request, Exhibit F- Letter from KCC, Exhibit G- Progress report, Exhibit H- Peters v. Univ of Cinc, Exhibit I- proposed TRO ) (Koss, Ryan) Modified text on 2/28/2019 (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Kellogg Community College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Smith
Represented By: Mark E. Kreter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellogg Community College
Represented By: Ryan J. Koss
Represented By: Joseph Abraham Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?