Trancik v. The Trinitarians of Mary
Plaintiff: Jerry Trancik
Defendant: The Trinitarians of Mary
Case Number: 1:2019cv00167
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE rescheduling hearing (change in time only): telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 5/9/2019 at 03:00 PM before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; all other provisions of the prior order remain in effect (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
April 25, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of LaRissa Dione Hollingsworth on behalf of plaintiff Jerry Trancik (Hollingsworth, LaRissa)
April 9, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #8 filed by The Trinitarians of Mary (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S) (McElwee, Michael)
April 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by defendant The Trinitarians of Mary; (McElwee, Michael)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 5/9/2019 at 04:30 PM before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; status report due by 5/6/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
March 15, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by The Trinitarians of Mary (McElwee, Michael)
March 15, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Michael S. McElwee on behalf of defendant The Trinitarians of Mary (McElwee, Michael)
March 14, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; The Trinitarians of Mary served on 3/11/2019, answer due 4/1/2019 (Anding, John)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant The Trinitarians of Mary (pjw)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (pjw)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Anding, John)
March 5, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Jerry Trancik in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4377509 (Anding, John) Modified text on 3/5/2019 (jlg)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against The Trinitarians of Mary filed by Jerry Trancik (Anding, John) Modified text on 3/5/2019 (jlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trancik v. The Trinitarians of Mary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Trinitarians of Mary
Represented By: Michael S. McElwee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Trancik
Represented By: John E. Anding
Represented By: LaRissa Dione Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?