Smith v. Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc.

Plaintiff: Mathew L. Smith
Defendant: Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00214
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Memorandum in Support of a Motion #24 filed by Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc. (Poncin, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in support of Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim #23 filed by Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc. (Poncin, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by defendant Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc.; (Poncin, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 22 Notice of WITHDRAWAL by defendant Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc. of MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Opposed #16 filed by Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc. (Poncin, Michael)
July 1, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Response to Motion #20 to Dismiss filed by Mathew L. Smith (Cotner, Roger)
July 1, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE TO MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Opposed #16 filed by Mathew L. Smith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Cotner, Roger)
July 1, 2019 Filing 19 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc. filed by Mathew L. Smith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Cotner, Roger)
June 7, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Memorandum in Support of a Motion #17 filed by Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc. (Poncin, Michael)
June 7, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in support of Motion to Dismiss/Failure to State a Claim #16 filed by Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc. (Poncin, Michael)
June 7, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim Opposed by defendant Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc.; (Poncin, Michael)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 motion for extension of time to answer; deadline extended to 6/7/2019; absent extraordinary circumstances, further requests will not be favored; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
May 24, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 #13 filed by Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc. (Poncin, Michael)
May 24, 2019 Filing 13 UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 by defendant Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc.; (Poncin, Michael)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 motion for extension of time to answer; deadline extended to 5/24/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
May 10, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 #10 filed by Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc. (Poncin, Michael)
May 10, 2019 Filing 10 UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 by defendant Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc.; (Poncin, Michael)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 motion for extension of time to answer; deadline extended to 5/10/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
April 11, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint #6 filed by Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc. (Poncin, Michael)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER regarding Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer #6 and certificate of concurrence; motion held in abeyance pending filing of certificate; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint by defendant Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc.; (Poncin, Michael)
April 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc. served on 3/22/2019, answer due 4/12/2019 (Cotner, Roger)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc. (clw)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (clw)
March 20, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Mathew L Smith in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4392467 (Cotner, Roger)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Cotner, Roger)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc. filed by Mathew L Smith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Cotner, Roger)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Scott Poncin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mathew L. Smith
Represented By: Roger G. Cotner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?