Best v. Cadillac Accounts Receivable Management, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Lonitta Best
Defendant: John Does 1-25, Cadillac Accounts Receivable Management, Inc. and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 1:2019cv00273
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 11/29/2019; dispositive motions due by 1/15/2020; early settlement conference set for 10/16/2019 at 01:00 PM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; final pretrial conference set for 8/12/2020 at 10:00 AM at 650 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody; jury trial set for 9/9/2020 at 09:00 AM at 650 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal)
May 22, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTES of scheduling conference by telephone held before Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody; case management order to issue (Proceedings Not Recorded) (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal)
May 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE rescheduling hearing that was previously set for 5/21/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Janet T. Neff: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 5/22/2019 at 10:00 AM at 664 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF REFERENCE pursuant to consent of parties to dispositive jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge; case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT (Taub, Adam)
May 14, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Yaakov Saks on behalf of plaintiff Lonitta Best (Saks, Yaakov)
May 14, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Daniel J. Ammon on behalf of defendant Cadillac Accounts Receivable Management, Inc. (Ammon, Daniel)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 5/21/2019 at 10:00 AM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; joint status report due by 5/14/2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cadillac Accounts Receivable Management, Inc. (Neidle, Gregory)
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Cadillac Accounts Receivable Management, Inc., Unknown Parties (Neidle, Gregory)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cadillac Accounts Receivable Management, Inc. (Neidle, Gregory)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Cadillac Accounts Receivable Management, Inc. (pjw)
April 11, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Gregory R. Neidle on behalf of defendants Cadillac Accounts Receivable Management, Inc., Unknown Parties (Neidle, Gregory)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Taub, Adam)
April 10, 2019 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Cadillac Accounts Receivable Management, Inc., Unknown Parties (none provided) (pjw)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (pjw)
April 9, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Lonitta Best in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4408442 (Taub, Adam)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Lonitta Best (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Taub, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Best v. Cadillac Accounts Receivable Management, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cadillac Accounts Receivable Management, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory R. Neidle
Represented By: Daniel J. Ammon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Represented By: Gregory R. Neidle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonitta Best
Represented By: Adam G. Taub
Represented By: Yaakov Saks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?