Razmus v. American Signature, Inc.

Plaintiff: Jacques X Razmus and Jacques X. Razmus
Defendant: American Signature, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00275
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in support of MOTION for judgment on the pleadings (partial) #10 filed by American Signature, Inc. (Cary, Nelson)
June 13, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE TO MOTION for judgment on the pleadings (partial) #10 filed by Jacques X. Razmus (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Boncher, Frederick)
June 11, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Jacques X. Razmus for Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents Directed to Defendant (Boncher, Frederick)
June 5, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Jacques X. Razmus for Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) (Boncher, Frederick)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 10/31/2019; dispositive motions due by 12/31/2019; settlement conference set for 5/14/2020 at 01:30 PM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; final pretrial conference set for 6/1/2020 at 09:00 AM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; jury trial set for 6/23/2020 at 08:45 AM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw)
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTES held before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green of Rule 16 scheduling conference; CMO to issue (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, ald)
May 16, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for judgment on the pleadings (partial) by defendant American Signature, Inc.; (Cary, Nelson)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER rescheduling Rule 16 conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 5/28/2019 at 02:30 PM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw)
May 10, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT STATUS REPORT (Cary, Nelson)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 5/15/2019 at 02:00 PM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; status report due by 5/10/2019; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER dismissing as moot motion for summary disposition as contained in #1 ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO Defendant's Motion for Summary Disposition filed by plaintiff Jacques X. Razmus (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Boncher, Frederick)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses (Amended Complaint) by American Signature, Inc. (Cary, Nelson)
April 16, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Frederick J. Boncher on behalf of plaintiff Jacques X. Razmus (Boncher, Frederick)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Signature, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Schottenstein Stores Corporation for American Signature, Inc. (Cary, Nelson)
April 11, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Nelson D. Cary on behalf of defendant American Signature, Inc. (Cary, Nelson)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (ns)
April 9, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant American Signature, Inc. in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4409141 (Skaggs, Elizabeth)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kent County Circuit Court case number 19-00604-CZ filed by American Signature, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Document(s) Part 1, #2 State Court Document(s) Part 2) (Skaggs, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Razmus v. American Signature, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Signature, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Wells Skaggs
Represented By: Nelson D. Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacques X Razmus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacques X. Razmus
Represented By: Frederick J. Boncher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?