Werking v. Werking et al
Plaintiff: David Werking and David Elliot Werking
Defendant: Beth Werking, Paul Werking, Paul Michael Werking and Beth Eileen Werking
Case Number: 1:2019cv00276
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Response in Opposition, #13 filed by David Elliot Werking (Greengard, Miles) Modified text on 6/4/2019 (ems).
June 3, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in opposition to AMENDED MOTION for summary judgment #12 , AMENDED MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction AMENDED MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #11 filed by David Elliot Werking (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14) (Greengard, Miles)
May 31, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED MOTION for summary judgment by defendants Beth Eileen Werking, Paul Michael Werking; (VanderBroek, Anne)
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , AMENDED MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by defendants Beth Eileen Werking, Paul Michael Werking; (VanderBroek, Anne)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER dismissing as moot #6 motion to dismiss and #7 motion for summary judgment; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE to attorney Miles Lynch Greengard regarding recent filing #8 (ems)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Beth Eileen Werking, Paul Michael Werking filed by David Elliot Werking (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14) (Greengard, Miles) Modified text on 5/22/2019 (ems).
May 3, 2019 Filing 7 FIRST MOTION for summary judgment by defendants Beth Eileen Werking, Paul Michael Werking; (VanderBroek, Anne)
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 FIRST MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim , FIRST MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction by defendants Beth Eileen Werking, Paul Michael Werking; (VanderBroek, Anne)
May 3, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Anne Marie VanderBroek on behalf of defendants Beth Eileen Werking, Paul Michael Werking (VanderBroek, Anne)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 (DISREGARD) FIRST MOTION for leave to appear General Appearance , FIRST MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim ( responses due 5/31/2019;), FIRST MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction ( responses due 5/31/2019;), FIRST MOTION for summary judgment ( responses due 5/31/2019;) by defendants Beth Eileen Werking, Paul Michael Werking; (Attachments: #1 Attachment Motion to Dismiss 12(b)1 and 12(b)(6), #2 Attachment Motion for Summary Judgment) (VanderBroek, Anne) Modified text/disregarded on 5/6/2019 under the directive of Chambers (jlb).
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Beth Eileen Werking, Paul Michael Werking (ems)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Greengard, Miles)
April 11, 2019 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Beth Eileen Werking, Paul Michael Werking (none provided) (ems)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ems)
April 10, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff David Elliot Werking in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4409871 (Greengard, Miles) Modified text on 4/11/2019 (jlg)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by David Elliot Werking (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Index) (Greengard, Miles) Modified text on 4/11/2019 (jlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Werking v. Werking et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Werking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Werking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Michael Werking
Represented By: Anne Marie VanderBroek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Eileen Werking
Represented By: Anne Marie VanderBroek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Werking
Represented By: Miles Lynch Greengard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Elliot Werking
Represented By: Miles Lynch Greengard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?