Newman v. Gourmet International, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Tiffany Newman
Defendant: Gourmet International, Ltd. and Gourmet International, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00287
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER; plaintiff to file amended complaint by 7/12/2019; defendant Gourmet International, LTD to file response to complaint by 7/26/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by plaintiff Tiffany Newman (Bultje, Crystal)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Tiffany Newman as to All Defendants (Howard, Sarah)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Gourmet International, Inc., Gourmet International, Ltd. (pjw)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (pjw)
April 16, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Crystal J. Bultje on behalf of plaintiff Tiffany Newman (Bultje, Crystal)
April 15, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Tiffany Newman in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4413847 (Howard, Sarah)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Gourmet International, Inc., Gourmet International, Ltd. filed by Tiffany Newman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - EEOC Right to Sue Letter, #2 Summons 1 - Gourmet International, Ltd., #3 Summons 2 - Gourmet International, Inc.) (Howard, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newman v. Gourmet International, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gourmet International, Ltd.
Represented By: Catherine Anne Brainerd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gourmet International, Inc.
Represented By: Catherine Anne Brainerd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Newman
Represented By: Sarah Riley Howard
Represented By: Crystal J. Bultje
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?