Simmons v. Simmons
Plaintiff: Lawrence Lynell Simmons
Defendant: Karen Sue Simmons
Case Number: 1:2019cv00302
Filed: April 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 OBJECTION by plaintiff Lawrence Lynell Simmons to Report and Recommendation #8 (jlb)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 RETURNED MAIL: Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #6 that was sent via U.S. Mail to Lawrence Lynell Simmons returned to the Court marked return to sender, not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward ;re-mailed to Lawrence Lynell Simmons 444 Terrace Ct. Kalamazoo, MI 49001 with #4 and #5 (mg)
May 16, 2019 Copy of Report and Recommendation #8 sent via U.S. Mail to Lawrence Lynell Simmons 444 Terrace Ct. Kalamazoo, MI 49001 (mg)
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Plaintiff's claims be dismissed; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, cbh)
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 RETURNED MAIL: Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #4 , Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #5 that was sent via U.S. Mail to Lawrence Lynell Simmons returned to the Court marked return to sender, unable to forward ;remailed to Lawrence Lynell Simmons 444 Terrance Ct. Kalamazoo, MI 49001 (along with a copy of #6 ) (mg)
May 1, 2019 Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Lawrence Lynell Simmons (mg)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
April 30, 2019 Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Lawrence Lynell Simmons (mg)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal)
April 30, 2019 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Lawrence Lynell Simmons (mg)
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of receipt of case (mg)
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Carmody indicating that this case is related to 1:19-cv-30 and 1:19-cv-189 (mg)
April 19, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (mg)
April 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Karen Sue Simmons filed by Lawrence Lynell Simmons (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document 1 Proposed summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons v. Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Lynell Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Sue Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?