Brewer v. Cedars Business Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Joshua K. Brewer
Defendant: Cedars Business Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00336
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT submitted for filing by plaintiff Joshua K. Brewer (Volheim, Nathan)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cedars Business Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Cedar Holdings International, Inc. for Cedars Business Services, LLC (Groendyk, Randall)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER regarding preparation of joint status report: status report due by 7/2/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that Defendant Cedars Business Services, LLC file a corporate disclosure statement within 7 days; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Cedars Business Services, LLC (Groendyk, Randall)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS returned executed; Cedars Business Services, LLC served on 5/13/2019, answer due 6/3/2019 (Volheim, Nathan)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Cedars Business Services, LLC (ems)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ems)
April 30, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis on behalf of plaintiff Joshua K. Brewer (Hatzidimitriadis, Taxiarchis)
April 30, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Eric Donald Coleman on behalf of plaintiff Joshua K. Brewer (Coleman, Eric)
April 30, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Ahmad Tayseer Sulaiman on behalf of plaintiff Joshua K. Brewer (Sulaiman, Ahmad)
April 30, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Nathan Charles Volheim on behalf of plaintiff Joshua K. Brewer (Volheim, Nathan)
April 30, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Joshua K. Brewer in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4426552 (Volheim, Nathan)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Cedars Business Services, LLC filed by Joshua K. Brewer (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Volheim, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brewer v. Cedars Business Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedars Business Services, LLC
Represented By: Randall J. Groendyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua K. Brewer
Represented By: Eric Donald Coleman
Represented By: Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis
Represented By: Ahmad Tayseer Sulaiman
Represented By: Nathan Charles Volheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?