York Risk Services Group, Inc. v. Couture
Plaintiff: York Risk Services Group, Inc.
Defendant: John Couture and McLarens, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00340
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant McLarens, Inc. (ns)
June 24, 2019 Filing 21 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #20 (Lario, Wendy)
June 24, 2019 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant McLarens, Inc. ; none provided (ns)
June 21, 2019 Filing 20 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against John Couture filed by York Risk Services Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Lario, Wendy)
June 17, 2019 CASE NUMBER 19-1655 assigned by the Sixth Circuit to appeal #18 (mkc)
June 17, 2019 Filing 19 LETTER FROM CCA regarding appeal #18 indicating that appeal has been docketed (ns)
June 13, 2019 APPEAL FEE PAID re #18 by defendant John Couture in the amount of $505, receipt number 0646-4460792 (Nelson, Matthew)
June 13, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL re #13 by defendant John Couture [Attorney Matthew T. Nelson added to party John Couture(pty:dft)] (Nelson, Matthew)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 7/18/2019 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; status report due by 7/12/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
June 3, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by John Couture (Pacific, Dean)
May 27, 2019 Filing 15 TRANSCRIPT of the Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction held May 17, 2019, before the Honorable Paul L. Maloney; NOTE: this transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the release of transcript restriction date; after that date it may be obtained through PACER; under the #Policy Regarding Transcripts the parties have 14 days within which to file a Notice of Intent to redact, and 21 days within which to file a Redaction Request; if no Transcript Redaction Request is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and this transcript will be made available via PACER after the release of transcript restriction set for 8/26/2019 ; redaction request due 6/17/2019 (Court Reporter-Transcriptionist: K. Thomas, (269) 385-3050)
May 17, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED MINUTES of motion hearing re #6 MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by York Risk Services Group, Inc.; motion granted, order to issue; held before District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Court Reporter: Kathleen Thomas) (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
May 17, 2019 Filing 13 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
May 17, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTES of motion hearing re #6 MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by York Risk Services Group, Inc.; motion granted, order to issue; held before District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Court Reporter: Kathleen Thomas) (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
May 15, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction #6 filed by John Couture (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Pacific, Dean)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending TRO; response to motion for preliminary injunction due by 5:00 p.m. on 5/15/2019; adjourning hearing on motion to 5/17/2019 at 9:00 a.m.; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
May 14, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER extending TRO and setting hearing by plaintiff York Risk Services Group, Inc. (Lario, Wendy)
May 14, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Dean F. Pacific on behalf of defendant John Couture (Pacific, Dean)
May 7, 2019 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED as to John Couture (as taken from #8 ) (ns)
May 7, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER from attorney Wendy Johnson Lario for plaintiff York Risk Services Group, Inc. regarding service of documents to Plaintiff John Couture [Attorney Wendy Johnson Lario added to party York Risk Services Group, Inc.(pty:pla)] (Lario, Wendy)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 motion for TRO; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction by plaintiff York Risk Services Group, Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Proposed Order) (Claydon, Jonathan)
May 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant John Couture (ns)
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ns)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Claydon, Jonathan)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by York Risk Services Group, Inc. (Claydon, Jonathan)
May 1, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff York Risk Services Group, Inc. in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4428186 (Claydon, Jonathan)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against John Couture filed by York Risk Services Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Claydon, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: York Risk Services Group, Inc. v. Couture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: York Risk Services Group, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Hale Claydon
Represented By: Wendy Johnson Lario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Couture
Represented By: Matthew T. Nelson
Represented By: Tamara Mia Reeves
Represented By: Dean F. Pacific
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McLarens, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?