Ruther v. Michigan, State of
Plaintiff: L. Ruther
Defendant: Michigan, State of
Case Number: 1:2019cv00342
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Robert J Jonker
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Copy of Order Rejecting Pleading #7 sent via U.S. Mail to L. Ruther (mg)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REJECTING Motion to Stay submitted by L. Ruther; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw)
May 29, 2019 Certified Copy of Order Dismissing Case (no motion) #6 sent via U.S. Mail to L. Ruther (mg)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: failed to satisfy the concerns of this Court's show cause order ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT re complaint #1 by plaintiff L. Ruther (mg)
May 9, 2019 Copy of Order to Show Cause (Deadline) #4 sent via U.S. Mail to L. Ruther (mg)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff to show cause by 5/20/2019 why this matter should not be dismissed without prejudice; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
May 6, 2019 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to L. Ruther (mg)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of receipt of case (mg)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (mg)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand (signature taken from in forma pauperis request) against Michigan, State of filed by L. Ruther (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruther v. Michigan, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. Ruther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?