Thomas v. Great American Rent-to-Own, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Courtney Thomas
Defendant: Patrick Stevens and Great American Rent-To-Own, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00347
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Copy of Order #7 sent via U.S. Mail to St. Joseph County Circuit Court (pjw)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 WRIT OF CERTIORARI; St. Joseph County Circuit Court to transmit certified copies of entire state court file in the matter of Thomas v. Aaron's, Inc., Case No. 19-145-CD by 7/12/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF IMPENDING DISMISSAL as to Defendant Patrick Stevens for failure to serve; verified Petition Regarding Service of Process to be submitted by 7/12/2019 or the case will be dismissed; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by defendant Great American Rent-to-Own, Inc. (Cohen, Daniel) Modified text on 5/14/2019 (pjw).
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Great American Rent-to-Own, Inc. (Cohen, Daniel) Modified text on 5/10/2019 (pjw).
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (pjw)
May 3, 2019 RECEIPT: in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4429352; for civil filing fee (jlb)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Kent indicating that this case is related to 1:18-cv-441 (jlb)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Joseph Circuit Court case number 19-145-CD filed by Great American Rent-To-Own, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -Opinion and Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Judgment, #3 Exhibit 3 - St. Joseph Circuit Ct. Case No. 19-145-CD, Complaint #4 Exhibit 4 - State Court Amend Complaint - St. Joseph Circuit Court, #5 Exhibit 5 - Certified Mail Receipt, #6 Exhibit 6 - Notice of Removal to St. Joseph Circuit Court) (Cohen, Daniel) Modified text on 5/7/2019 (pjw) and filers on 5/16/2019 (pjw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Great American Rent-to-Own, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Thomas
Represented By: Jason Ryan Pelak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Stevens
Represented By: Daniel G. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Rent-To-Own, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel G. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?