Andree v. Kentwood Public Schools
Plaintiff: Ned F. Andree
Defendant: Kentwood Public Schools
Case Number: 1:2019cv00356
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Robert J Jonker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Kentwood Public Schools re Joint Status Report (Rule 16) #14 (Longworth, Gregory)
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 JOINT STATUS REPORT (Longworth, Gregory)
June 12, 2019 Copy of Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, #13 sent via U.S. Mail to Ned F. Andree (ems)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 7/8/2019 at 10:30 AM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; status report due by 7/2/2019; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw)
June 6, 2019 Copy of Order on Motion for Order #12 sent via U.S. Mail to Ned F. Andree (ems)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #7 motion for order; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw)
June 5, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Kentwood Public Schools re Answer to Complaint #10 (Longworth, Gregory)
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Kentwood Public Schools (Longworth, Gregory) Modified text on 6/5/2019 (ems).
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Kentwood Public Schools re Attorney Appearance, Attorney Appearance (Grate, Marshall)
May 28, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Gregory N. Longworth on behalf of defendant Kentwood Public Schools (Longworth, Gregory)
May 28, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Marshall W. Grate on behalf of defendant Kentwood Public Schools (Grate, Marshall)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Ned F. Andree re MOTION for order to accept document as return of service #7 (ems)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for order to accept document as return of service by plaintiff Ned F. Andree; (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (ems)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Ned F. Andree for Summons and Complaint (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (clw)
May 9, 2019 Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #5 , Order on Motion to Serve the Complaint #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Ned F. Andree (ems)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #2 motion to serve the complaint; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
May 7, 2019 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Ned F. Andree (ems)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of receipt of case (ems)
May 6, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Kentwood Public Schools and returned to plaintiff (in the event the motion for service is denied) (ems) Modified text on 5/7/2019 (ems).
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to serve the complaint by plaintiff Ned F. Andree; (ems)
May 6, 2019 RECEIPT: in the amount of $400.00, receipt number GR065929; for civil filing fee (ems)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Kentwood Public Schools filed by Ned F. Andree (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ems)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andree v. Kentwood Public Schools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentwood Public Schools
Represented By: Marshall W. Grate
Represented By: Gregory N. Longworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ned F. Andree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?