Ruther v. Von Stach et al
Plaintiff: L. Ruther
Defendant: Michigan, State of and John Von Stach
Case Number: 1:2019cv00357
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Copy of Order Rejecting Pleading #9 sent via U.S. Mail to L. Ruther (pjw)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REJECTING Document containing several requests submitted by L. Ruther; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document) (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw)
June 21, 2019 Copy of Order on Motion to Stay #8 sent via U.S. Mail to L. Ruther (pjw)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #7 motion to for reconsideration and reaffirms its order of 6/6/2019 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to stay re #6 Order by plaintiff L. Ruther; (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (pjw)
June 6, 2019 Certified Copy of Order Dismissing Case #6 sent via U.S. Mail to L. Ruther (pjw)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: failure to satisfy the Court's show cause order ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
May 14, 2019 Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #5 sent via U.S. Mail to L. Ruther (pjw)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw)
May 10, 2019 Copy of Order to Show Cause (Deadline) #4 sent via U.S. Mail to L. Ruther (pjw)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff to show cause by 5/20/2019; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
May 8, 2019 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to L. Ruther (pjw)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of receipt of case (pjw)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (pjw)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by L. Ruther (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (pjw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruther v. Von Stach et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. Ruther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Von Stach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?