Stevenson v. Roberts et al
Plaintiff: Malikah Stevenson
Defendant: Additional Parties and Jason Roberts
Case Number: 1:2019cv00362
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Certified Copy of Order Regarding Report and Recommendation #10 , Judgment #11 sent via U.S. Mail to Malikah Stevenson (mg)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 JUDGMENT in accordance with the Opinion and Order in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 OPINION AND ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #6 ; Judgment to issue; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE regarding case by plaintiff Malikah Stevenson (mg)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by plaintiff Malikah Stevenson (mg)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 OBJECTION by plaintiff Malikah Stevenson to Report and Recommendation #6 (mg)
May 23, 2019 Copy of Report and Recommendation #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Malikah Stevenson 1325 Fox Ridge Dr. Apt. 112 Kalamazoo, MI 49006 (mg)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Plaintiff's claims be dismissed; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, cbh)
May 9, 2019 Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #4 , Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Malikah Stevenson (mg)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
May 8, 2019 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Malikah Stevenson (mg)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of receipt of case (mg)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (mg)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Additional Parties, Jason Roberts filed by Malikah Stevenson (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevenson v. Roberts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Additional Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malikah Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?