Karpowski v. Wells Fargo Dealer Services
Plaintiff: Patrick Karpowski
Defendant: Wells Fargo Dealer Services
Case Number: 1:2019cv00363
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Robert J Jonker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Copy of Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order #15 sent via U.S. Mail to Patrick Karpowski (pjw)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER finding as moot STIPULATION #12 ; granting STIPULATION #14 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw)
June 24, 2019 Filing 14 CORRECTED PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Corrected by defendant Wells Fargo Dealer Services; this entry replaces #12 (Gottlieb, Amy) Modified text on 6/25/2019 (pjw).
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE to attorney Amy Gottlieb regarding recent filing #12 (pjw)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by defendant Wells Fargo Dealer Services (Gottlieb, Amy)
June 19, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Amy Sabbota Gottlieb on behalf of defendant Wells Fargo Dealer Services (Gottlieb, Amy)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 SECOND SUMMONS returned executed; Wells Fargo Dealer Services served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (pjw) Modified text on 6/18/2019 (pjw).
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed; Wells Fargo Dealer Services served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019 (pjw)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Wells Fargo Dealer Services and mailed to plaintiff (pjw) Modified text on 6/4/2019 (pjw).
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE re filing fee; Notice of Payment of Filing Fees by plaintiff Patrick Karpowski (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (pjw) Modified text on 6/4/2019 (pjw).
June 3, 2019 RECEIPT: in the amount of $400.00, receipt number GR066330; for filing fee (mkc)
May 20, 2019 Copy of Deficiency Order #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Patrick Karpowski (pjw)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DEFICIENCY ORDER: plaintiff has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 6/14/2019 or the action will be dismissed filing fee to be submitted by 6/14/2019; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw)
May 14, 2019 Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Patrick Karpowski (pjw)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
May 10, 2019 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Patrick Karpowski (jlg)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of receipt of case (jlg)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from plaintiff requesting summons be returned to him to effectuate service on defendant (jlg)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE APPLICATION for electronic filing and service by plaintiff Patrick Karpowski (jlg)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (named as Motion to Approve Filing Fee Payment Schedule) by plaintiff Patrick Karpowski; (jlg)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Dealer Services filed by Patrick Karpowski (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons) (jlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karpowski v. Wells Fargo Dealer Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Dealer Services
Represented By: Amy Sabbota Gottlieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Karpowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?