Walters v. Challenge Manufacturing Company
Plaintiff: Lenore Ellen Walters
Defendant: Challenge Manufacturing Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00377
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT re complaint #1 by plaintiff Lenore Ellen Walters (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (pjw)
May 17, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Challenge Manufacturing Company and delivered to US Marshal for service (pjw)
May 16, 2019 Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #4 and Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Lenore Ellen Walters (pjw)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT re complaint #1 (document named as supporting documents for original filed case) by plaintiff Lenore Ellen Walters (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (pjw)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal)
May 15, 2019 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Lenore Ellen Walters (pjw)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of receipt of case (pjw)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (pjw)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Challenge Manufacturing Company filed by Lenore Ellen Walters (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (pjw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walters v. Challenge Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenore Ellen Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Challenge Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?