Marvin v. Fluegeman et al
Plaintiff: Steven L. Marvin
Defendant: Ray Fluegeman, Janet Cable and Lynn Owens
Case Number: 1:2019cv00382
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed by US Marshal by mail with acknowledgment of receipt of summons and complaint by Samuel Wells for Ray Fluegeman served on 6/28/2019, answer due 8/27/2019 (mg)
June 14, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Janet Cable, Ray Fluegeman, Lynn Owens, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and delivered to US Marshal for service (mg)
May 22, 2019 Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Steven L. Marvin (mg)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Magistrate Judge Ray Kent, fhw)
May 17, 2019 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Steven L. Martin (mg)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of receipt of case (mg)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (mg)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (mg)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Janet Cable, Ray Fluegeman, Lynn Owens filed by Steven L. Marvin (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marvin v. Fluegeman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Fluegeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Cable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven L. Marvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?