United States of America v. Ouwenga
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Karen A. Ouwenga
Case Number: 1:2019cv00388
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Karen A. Ouwenga re MOTION to dismiss order denying motion to dismiss and setting answer deadline and order to settle the account #10 (clw)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to dismiss order denying motion to dismiss and setting answer deadline and order to settle the account by defendant Karen A. Ouwenga; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (clw)
July 1, 2019 Copy of Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #8 , Order Regarding Preparation of Joint Status Report #9 sent via U.S. Mail to Karen A. Ouwenga (clw)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER regarding preparation of joint status report: joint status report due by 7/26/2019 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #6 motion to dismiss; the Court sets a deadline of 7/26/2019 for Ms. Ouwenga to file a timely Answer ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Karen A. Ouwenga re MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #6 (clw)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by defendant Karen A. Ouwenga; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (clw)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; Karen A. Ouwenga served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019 (Moore, Carl)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Karen A. Ouwenga (clw)
May 17, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Ryan D. Cobb on behalf of plaintiff United States of America (Cobb, Ryan)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Moore, Carl)
May 16, 2019 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant Karen A. Ouwenga (none provided) (clw)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (clw)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Karen A. Ouwenga filed by United States of America (Moore, Carl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Ouwenga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen A. Ouwenga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Carl Lewis Moore
Represented By: Ryan D. Cobb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?