Akin v. McDonald's USA, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Amy S Akin and Amy S. Akin
Defendant: McDonald's USA, LLC, True North Company, Inc. d/b/a McDonald's and True North Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00403
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Robert J Jonker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Edward C. Young on behalf of defendant McDonald's USA, LLC (Young, Edward)
July 8, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE TO ANSWER TO COMPLAINT/PETITION re #12 filed by plaintiff Amy S. Akin (Brault, Darcie)
July 8, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE TO ANSWER TO COMPLAINT/PETITION re #11 filed by plaintiff Amy S. Akin (Brault, Darcie)
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by True North Company, Inc. (Anderson, John)
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McDonald's USA, LLC identifying Corporate Parent McDonald's Corporation for McDonald's USA, LLC (Telman, Nigel)
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and Proof of Service by True North Company, Inc. (Anderson, John) Modified text on 7/3/2019 (pjw).
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by McDonald's USA, LLC (Telman, Nigel)
July 2, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Angelina R. Irvine on behalf of defendant McDonald's USA, LLC (Irvine, Angelina)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 8/8/2019 at 04:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; status report due by 8/1/2019; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting STIPULATION #8 ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER granting defendants an extension of time to respond to plaintiff's complaint by defendant McDonald's USA, LLC (Telman, Nigel) Modified text on 6/14/2019 (pjw).
June 13, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Nigel F. Telman on behalf of defendant McDonald's USA, LLC (Telman, Nigel)
June 13, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of John A. Anderson on behalf of defendant True North Company, Inc. , only (Anderson, John)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed; True North Company, Inc. served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019 (Brault, Darcie) Modified text on 6/10/2019 (pjw).
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE to attorney Darcie Brault regarding recent filing #5 (clw)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; McDonald's USA, LLC served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019 (Brault, Darcie) Modified text on 5/29/2019 (clw).
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants McDonald's USA, LLC, True North Company, Inc. (pjw)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Brault, Darcie)
May 21, 2019 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants McDonald's USA, LLC, True North Company, Inc. (none provided) (pjw)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (pjw)
May 20, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Amy S Akin in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4442210 (Brault, Darcie)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against McDonald's USA, LLC, True North Company, Inc. d/b/a McDonald's filed by Amy S Akin (Brault, Darcie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Akin v. McDonald's USA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDonald's USA, LLC
Represented By: Edward C. Young
Represented By: Nigel F. Telman
Represented By: Angelina R. Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: True North Company, Inc. d/b/a McDonald's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: True North Company, Inc.
Represented By: John A. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy S Akin
Represented By: Darcie R. Brault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy S. Akin
Represented By: Darcie R. Brault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?