Neubauer-Perkins, Inc. et al v. CPD Distribution, LLC
Plaintiff: Smith & Nephew, Inc. and Neubauer-Perkins, Inc.
Defendant: CPD Distribution, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00404
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting STIPULATION #6 ; Defendant's first responsive pleading to the complaint due 7/30/2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension of Time for Defendant CPD Distribution, LLC to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by defendant CPD Distribution, LLC (Turco, Michael)
July 8, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Michael R. Turco on behalf of defendant CPD Distribution, LLC (Turco, Michael)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of CPD Distribution, LLC served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019 (Ankers, Gary)
May 22, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jaclyn Rose Therese Giffen on behalf of plaintiffs Neubauer-Perkins, Inc., Smith & Nephew, Inc. (Giffen, Jaclyn)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant CPD Distribution, LLC (clw)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (clw)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Ankers, Gary)
May 20, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiffs Neubauer-Perkins, Inc., Smith & Nephew, Inc. in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4442308 (Ankers, Gary)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Exhibits 1-3 against CPD Distribution, LLC filed by Neubauer-Perkins, Inc., Smith & Nephew, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Ankers, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neubauer-Perkins, Inc. et al v. CPD Distribution, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Represented By: Gary Chester Ankers
Represented By: Jaclyn Rose Therese Giffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neubauer-Perkins, Inc.
Represented By: Gary Chester Ankers
Represented By: Jaclyn Rose Therese Giffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPD Distribution, LLC
Represented By: Michael R. Turco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?