Hughes v. Thrivent Financial for Lutherans
Plaintiff: Jessie W. Hughes
Defendant: Thrivent Financial for Lutherans
Case Number: 1:2019cv00406
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 1/8/2020; dispositive motions due by 2/7/2020; settlement conference set for 6/17/2020 at 01:30 PM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; final pretrial conference set for 8/10/2020 at 09:00 AM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; jury trial set for 9/1/2020 at 08:45 AM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTES held before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green of Rule 16 scheduling conference; CMO to issue (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, ald)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT (Ingleson, Harry)
June 14, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Kathleen H. Klaus on behalf of defendant Thrivent Financial for Lutherans (Klaus, Kathleen)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 DEMAND for TRIAL BY JURY by plaintiff Jessie W. Hughes (Ingleson, Harry)
June 11, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Harry Ingleson, II on behalf of plaintiff Jessie W. Hughes (Ingleson, Harry)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER rescheduling Rule 16 conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 7/9/2019 at 02:00 PM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; status report due by 7/3/2019; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 6/26/2019 at 11:30 AM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; status report due by 6/21/2019; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Thrivent Financial for Lutherans (Roth, Jesse)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Thrivent Financial for Lutherans (Roth, Jesse)
May 22, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant Thrivent Financial for Lutherans in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4443676 (Roth, Jesse)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee re corporate disclosure statement (ems)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by defendant Thrivent Financial for Lutherans re Notice of Removal #1 (Roth, Jesse)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (with Exhibits 1 & 2) from Emmet County Probate Court case number 13-013712-DE filed by Thrivent Financial for Lutherans (Roth, Jesse) Modified text on 5/22/2019 (ems).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes v. Thrivent Financial for Lutherans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie W. Hughes
Represented By: Harry Ingleson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thrivent Financial for Lutherans
Represented By: Jesse Louis Roth
Represented By: Kathleen H. Klaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?