Skywatcher, LLC v. Oliver et al

Plaintiff: Skywatcher, LLC
Defendant: Gregory R. Oliver, Comprenew, Standard Solar, Inc and Agathon Solar, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00409
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Agathon Solar, LLC (Lauka, Jeshua)
July 19, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Patrick Larry Rawsthorne on behalf of defendant Comprenew (Rawsthorne, Patrick)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #15 and #18 motions for extension of time to answer; deadline for defendants Standard Solar, Inc. and Comprenew to answer or otherwise plead is extended to 8/6/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER that that Defendant Agathon Solar, LLC file a corporate disclosure statement within 7 days; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
July 16, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants Agathon Solar, LLC, Gregory R. Oliver re Attorney Appearance, Answer to Amended Complaint #21 , Answer to Amended Complaint #22 , Attorney Appearance (Lauka, Jeshua)
July 16, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #6 with affirmative defenses by Gregory R. Oliver (Lauka, Jeshua)
July 16, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #6 with affirmative defenses by Agathon Solar, LLC (Lauka, Jeshua)
July 16, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jeshua Thomas Lauka on behalf of defendant Gregory R. Oliver (Lauka, Jeshua)
July 16, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jeshua Thomas Lauka on behalf of defendant Agathon Solar, LLC (Lauka, Jeshua)
July 16, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #6 or Otherwise Plead #18 filed by Comprenew (Huget, J.)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER regarding defendant Comprenew's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer #18 and certificate of concurrence; motion held in abeyance pending filing of certificate; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
July 15, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #6 or Otherwise Plead by defendant Comprenew; (Huget, J.)
July 15, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of J. Michael Huget on behalf of defendant Comprenew (Huget, J.)
July 15, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Complaint - EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION REQUESTED #15 filed by Standard Solar, Inc (Dugan, Conor)
July 15, 2019 Filing 16 BRIEF in support of MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Complaint - EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION REQUESTED #15 filed by Standard Solar, Inc (Dugan, Conor)
July 15, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Complaint - EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION REQUESTED by defendant Standard Solar, Inc; (Dugan, Conor)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER; deadline for defendant Standard Solar, Inc to response to complaint is extended to 7/18/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
June 26, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension of Time for Defendant Standard Solar, Inc. to Respond to Complaint by defendant Standard Solar, Inc [Attorney Conor Brendan Dugan added to party Standard Solar, Inc(pty:dft)] (Dugan, Conor)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE on behalf of Agathon Solar, LLC answer due 6/26/2019; Gregory R. Oliver answer due 6/26/2019 (Greengard, Miles)
June 13, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed; Standard Solar, Inc served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019 (Greengard, Miles)
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS returned executed; Comprenew served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019 (Greengard, Miles)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Agathon Solar, LLC, Comprenew, Gregory R. Oliver, Standard Solar, Inc (mg)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Skywatcher, LLC (Greengard, Miles)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #6 (Greengard, Miles)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 Plaintiff's First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Skywatcher, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Greengard, Miles)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Skywatcher, LLC (Greengard, Miles)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Agathon Solar, LLC, Comprenew, Gregory R. Oliver, Standard Solar, Inc (mg)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (mg)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Greengard, Miles)
May 22, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Skywatcher, LLC in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4444139 (Greengard, Miles)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Skywatcher, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Greengard, Miles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skywatcher, LLC v. Oliver et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory R. Oliver
Represented By: Jeshua Thomas Lauka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comprenew
Represented By: Patrick Larry Rawsthorne
Represented By: J. Michael Huget
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Solar, Inc
Represented By: Conor Brendan Dugan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agathon Solar, LLC
Represented By: Jeshua Thomas Lauka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skywatcher, LLC
Represented By: Miles Lynch Greengard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?