Horn v. Kistler et al
Plaintiff: Steven Horn
Defendant: KCP Consultores, KCP Dynamics, KCP Dynamics Group, Gerry Kistler and KCP Dynamics Bogota
Case Number: 1:2019cv00417
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Robert J Jonker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff to either file a request for default by 7/31/2019 or show cause in writing why the Court should not dismiss the case against Defendant KCP Dynamics Group for lack of prosecution ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; KCP Dynamics Group served on 6/6/2019; answer due 6/27/2019 (Kraft, Daniel) Modified text on 7/16/2019 (pjw).
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants KCP Consultores, KCP Dynamics Bogota, KCP Dynamics Group, Gerry Kistler (jlg)
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (jlg)
May 30, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Steven Horn in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4449945 (Kraft, Daniel)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Kraft, Daniel)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Steven Horn (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Kraft, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horn v. Kistler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KCP Consultores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KCP Dynamics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KCP Dynamics Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerry Kistler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KCP Dynamics Bogota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Horn
Represented By: Daniel L. Kraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?