Camp v. Diversified Consultants, Inc.
Plaintiff: Calvin Camp
Defendant: Diversified Consultants, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00418
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Copy of Order Regarding Dismissal Papers #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Morgan I. Marcus (clw)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER requiring dismissal papers to be filed no later than 8/26/2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Settlement by plaintiff Calvin Camp (Davidson, Joseph)
July 10, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Joseph Scott Davidson on behalf of plaintiff Calvin Camp (Davidson, Joseph)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Calvin Camp as to Diversified Consultants, Inc. waiver sent on 6/4/2019, answer due 8/5/2019 [Attorney Nathan Charles Volheim added to party Calvin Camp(pty:pla)] (Volheim, Nathan)
June 3, 2019 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant Diversified Consultants, Inc. (none provided) (clw)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff (clw)
May 31, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Calvin Camp in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4450025 (Taylor, Alexander)
May 30, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Alexander James Taylor on behalf of plaintiff Calvin Camp (Taylor, Alexander)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Diversified Consultants, Inc. filed by Calvin Camp (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Taylor, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Camp v. Diversified Consultants, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Camp
Represented By: Alexander James Taylor
Represented By: Nathan Charles Volheim
Represented By: Joseph Scott Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversified Consultants, Inc.
Represented By: Morgan I. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?