Gutierrez v. Richard A. Handlon Correctional Facility et al
Plaintiff: Cecilia Catherine Gutierrez
Defendant: Andrew B. Birge, Vincent H. Cohen, Jr., Unknown Sutton, Ronald McComb, Lloyd Blackman, M. Dwyer, Robert McGeorge, K. Beltz, Monique Dingeldey, Stacy Straw, Steve Card, Dave Shaver, Unknown McKendry, M. Partral, Michelle Sage, Shane McDonald, DeWayne Burton, Heidi E. Washington, Richard A Handlon Corrections, Steven McNulty and Richard A. Handlon Correctional Facility
Case Number: 1:2019cv00425
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT of Damages or Other Relief against All Defendants filed by Cecilia Catherine Gutierrez (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mlc)
July 15, 2019 Copy of Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #9 sent via U.S. Mail to Cecilia Catherine Gutierrez (pjw)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 motion for extension of time; Plaintiff shall, no later than 7/26/2019, file her objections, if any, to the report and recommendation #7 ; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply re #7 by plaintiff Cecilia Catherine Gutierrez; (ns)
June 20, 2019 Copy of Report and Recommendation #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Cecilia Catherine Gutierrez (ns)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that plaintiff's complaint be dismissed; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, cbh)
June 10, 2019 Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Cecilia Catherine Gutierrez (ns)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
June 6, 2019 Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Cecilia Catherine Gutierrez (ns)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal)
June 5, 2019 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Cecilia Catherine Gutierrez (ns)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of receipt of case (ns)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE APPLICATION for electronic filing and service by plaintiff Cecilia Catherine Gutierrez (ns)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (ns)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Cecilia Catherine Gutierrez (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Proposed Document to be Issued by the Court Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ns)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gutierrez v. Richard A. Handlon Correctional Facility et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew B. Birge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent H. Cohen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald McComb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd Blackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert McGeorge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Beltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monique Dingeldey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy Straw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Card
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Shaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown McKendry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Partral
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Sage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeWayne Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi E. Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A Handlon Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A. Handlon Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecilia Catherine Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?