United States of America v. $6,800.00 United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $6,800.00 United States Currency
Case Number: 1:2019cv00441
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION for entry of default judgment as to Request For Entry Of Default Against Demetrius Stimage, John Rambo, Raynard Mackey And Precious Dixon (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order) (Murnahan, Jennifer)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Complaint For Forfeiture by plaintiff United States of America (Murnahan, Jennifer) Modified text on 6/18/2019 (ems).
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff United States of America for Warrant of Arrest In Rem (Murnahan, Jennifer)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (ems)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified Complaint For Forfeiture In Rem) against $6,800.00 United States Currency filed by United States of America (Murnahan, Jennifer) Modified text on 6/10/2019 (ems).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $6,800.00 United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $6,800.00 United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jennifer Smith Murnahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?