Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 24.247.181.144

Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 24.247.181.144
Case Number: 1:2019cv00444
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Robert J Jonker
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 motion for leave to serve third party subpoena prior to Rule 26(f) Conference ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in support of Motion for Leave to File #7 filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Susan B. Stalzer, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Greg Lansky, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Tobias Fieser) (Bernier, Joel)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED MOTION for leave to file by plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bernier, Joel)
June 13, 2019 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 24.247.181.144 (none provided) (clw)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (clw)
June 11, 2019 Copy of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright #5 , complaint #1 sent via U.S. Mail to Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office (clw)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT from the Clerk, WDMI, to the Register of Copyrights on the filing of a COPYRIGHT ACTION (clw)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Bernier, Joel)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in support of Motion for Leave to File #2 filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Susan B. Stalzer, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Greg Lansky, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Tobias Fieser) (Bernier, Joel)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to file by plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bernier, Joel)
June 7, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4456426 (Bernier, Joel)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 24.247.181.144 filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A) (Bernier, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 24.247.181.144
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Joel Alexander Bernier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP Address 24.247.181.144
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?