Scoby v. Connolly et al
Plaintiff: Robert Scoby
Defendant: Schneider National Carriers, Inc., Gary Connolly, Old Republic Insurance Company and Schneider National, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00474
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 15 PLAINTIFF'S LAY AND EXPERT WITNESS LIST by plaintiff Robert Scoby (De Haan, Stephen)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTES of scheduling conference held before Judge Janet T. Neff (Court Reporter: not recorded) (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
July 18, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Michael J. Hutchinson on behalf of defendants Gary Connolly, Old Republic Insurance Company, Schneider National, Inc. (Hutchinson, Michael)
July 18, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Tara Samantha Cannatella on behalf of defendants Gary Connolly, Old Republic Insurance Company, Schneider National, Inc. (Cannatella, Tara) Modified text on 7/18/2019 (clw).
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 JOINT STATUS REPORT (AMENDED) (De Haan, Stephen)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT STATUS REPORT (De Haan, Stephen)
June 24, 2019 Copy of Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, #10 sent via U.S. Mail to Stephen J. De Haan (clw)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 7/22/2019 at 11:30 AM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; joint status report due by 7/15/2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Gary Connolly, Old Republic Insurance Company, Schneider National, Inc. (Cannatella, Tara) Modified text on 6/21/2019 (clw).
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER from Clerk to attorney Stephen J. De Haan regarding mandatory electronic filing (clw)
June 19, 2019 Copy of Order #7 and Letter #8 sent via U.S. Mail to Stephen J. De Haan (clw) Modified text on 6/19/2019 (clw).
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER striking answer #2 ; Defendants shall file a corrected answer no later than 7 days from the date of this Order; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
June 17, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendants Gary Connolly, Old Republic Insurance Company, Schneider National, Inc. in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4463582 (Cannatella, Tara)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee (clw)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants Gary Connolly, Old Republic Insurance Company, Schneider National, Inc. re Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 , Notice of Removal #1 , Answer to Complaint #2 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #3 (Cannatella, Tara) Modified text on 6/14/2019 (jlg)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Schneider National, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Schneider National, Inc. for Schneider National, Inc. (Cannatella, Tara) Modified text on 6/14/2019 (jlg)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Old Republic Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Old Republic International, Inc. for Old Republic Insurance Company (Cannatella, Tara)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 (STRICKEN) ANSWER to complaint with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Gary Connolly, Old Republic Insurance Company, Schneider National, Inc. (Cannatella, Tara) Modified text on 6/14/2019 (jlg) Modified text on 6/19/2019 (clw).
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Based Upon Diversity of Citizenship from Kent County Circuit Court case number 19-04113-NI filed by Schneider National, Inc., Gary Connolly (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint) (Cannatella, Tara) Modified text on 6/14/2019 (jlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scoby v. Connolly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider National Carriers, Inc.
Represented By: Tara Samantha Cannatella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Connolly
Represented By: Tara Samantha Cannatella
Represented By: Michael J. Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Insurance Company
Represented By: Tara Samantha Cannatella
Represented By: Michael J. Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneider National, Inc.
Represented By: Tara Samantha Cannatella
Represented By: Michael J. Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Scoby
Represented By: Stephen J. De Haan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?