Yorty v. Equifax, Inc.
Plaintiff: Heatherlee Yorty
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00476
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 SIGNATURE PAGE submitted by plaintiff Heatherlee Yorty for complaint #1 (ems)
June 18, 2019 Copy of Conditional Order Striking Pleading or Other Paper #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Heatherlee Yorty (ems)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CONDITIONAL ORDER striking complaint #1 unless the filing party submits a signature page within 21 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw)
June 17, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Equifax, Inc. and mailed to plaintiff (ems) Modified text on 6/17/2019 (ems).
June 17, 2019 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #2 sent via U.S. Mail to Heatherlee Yorty (ems)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of receipt of case (ems)
June 14, 2019 RECEIPT: in the amount of $400.00, receipt number KZ003869; for civil filing fee (ems)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 UNSIGNED COMPLAINT with jury demand against Equifax, Inc. filed by Heatherlee Yorty (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment 2) (ems) Modified text on 6/17/2019 (ems).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yorty v. Equifax, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heatherlee Yorty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?