Fuller v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Larry Fuller
Defendant: Trott Law, Jamie Dimon, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Marsha Sanderson and Schneiderman & Sherman, P.C.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00482
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Gordon J Quist
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Copy of Order #28 sent via U.S. Mail to Larry Fuller (mg)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DISMISSING COUNT 16; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
August 6, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by defendant Trott Law; (Levine, Matthew)
July 30, 2019 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Trott Law (Levine, Matthew)
July 30, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Matthew David Levine on behalf of defendant Trott Law (Levine, Matthew)
July 29, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Larry Fuller re Reply to Response to Motion, #24 (mg)
July 29, 2019 Filing 24 REPLY to response to motion #11 , #12 titled as "Supplemental to plaintiff's application for entry of default and plaintiff's response in opposition to defendants' Chase and Jaime Dimon opposition to plainitiff's application for entry of default" filed by Larry Fuller (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (mg)
July 26, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. for on filings 20, 21, 22 (Williams, Dawn)
July 26, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for temporary restraining order #13 filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Williams, Dawn)
July 25, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-6) (Williams, Dawn)
July 25, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (personal) by defendant Jamie Dimon; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-6) (Williams, Dawn)
July 24, 2019 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Schneiderman & Sherman, P.C. with certificate of service (Jacobs, Steven) Modified text on 7/24/2019 (mg).
July 24, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by defendant Schneiderman & Sherman, P.C.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Sheriffs Deed, #2 Exhibit 2 Hardwick v HSBC Bank USA, N.A., #3 Exhibit 3 - Beard v HSBC Mortg. Services, #4 Exhibit 4 - Golden v Bank of N.Y. Mellon Trust Co., #5 Exhibit 5 - Robbins v Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.) (Jacobs, Steven)
July 24, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Steven A. Jacobs on behalf of defendant Schneiderman & Sherman, P.C. (Jacobs, Steven)
July 19, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants Jamie Dimon, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. re Response in Opposition, #16 (Williams, Dawn)
July 18, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in opposition to APPLICATION for entry of default as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. #11 , APPLICATION for entry of default as to Jamie Dimon #12 filed by Jamie Dimon, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Williams, Dawn)
July 16, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Larry Fuller re Certificate Regarding Motion Concurrence #14 , MOTION for temporary restraining order #13 (mg)
July 16, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for temporary restraining order #13 filed by Larry Fuller (mg)
July 16, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for temporary restraining order by plaintiff Larry Fuller; (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Larry Fuller, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8) (mg)
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Jamie Dimon (DEFAULT NOT ENTERED; affidavit incomplete and defendants filed #10 showing intent to respond) (mg) Modified text on 7/18/2019 (mg).
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION for entry of default as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (DEFAULT NOT ENTERED; affidavit incomplete and defendants filed #10 showing intent to respond) (mg) Modified text on 7/18/2019 (mg).
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE by defendants Jamie Dimon, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. to Order to Show Cause (Deadline) #9 (Williams, Dawn)
June 28, 2019 Copy of Order to Show Cause (Deadline) #9 sent via U.S. Mail to Larry Fuller (mg)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Parties to show cause by 7/11/2019; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
June 20, 2019 Copy of Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #8 sent via U.S. Mail to Larry Fuller (mg)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 motion for extension of time to file; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re FIRST MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply re #1 #5 filed by Jamie Dimon, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Williams, Dawn)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 BRIEF in support of FIRST MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply re #1 #5 filed by Jamie Dimon, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Williams, Dawn)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply re #1 by defendants Jamie Dimon, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.; (Williams, Dawn)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Gordon J. Quist (ns)
June 18, 2019 Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Larry Fuller (ns)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jamie Dimon, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Williams, Dawn)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING notice of removal re #1 directed to Larry Fuller, Kalamazoo County Circuit Court by defendants Jamie Dimon, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Williams, Dawn)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kalamazoo County Circuit Court case number 2019-0246-CK filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Jamie Dimon (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Williams, Dawn)
June 17, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendants Jamie Dimon, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4463630 (Williams, Dawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fuller v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trott Law
Represented By: Matthew David Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Dimon
Represented By: Dawn Nicole Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Dawn Nicole Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsha Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schneiderman & Sherman, P.C.
Represented By: Steven A. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?