Farm Bureau General Insurance Company of Michigan et al v. Gree USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company of Michigan and Farm Bureau General Insurance Company of Michigan
Defendant: Gree Electric Appliances Incorporated of Zhuhai, Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliances Sales, Limited and Gree USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00506
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE TO FIRST MOTION to quash Improper Service Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(5) #16 filed by Farm Bureau General Insurance Company of Michigan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 (part 1 of 2), #3 Exhibit 2 (part 2 of 2)) (VanBronkhorst, Andrew) Modified text on 8/23/2019 (ems).
August 20, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by plaintiffs Farm Bureau General Insurance Company of Michigan, Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company of Michigan re Summons Issued #8 , Summons Issued #4 , Amended Complaint, #5 (VanBronkhorst, Andrew)
August 15, 2019 Filing 27 AMENDED ANSWER to Amended Complaint #5 with Affirmative Defenses filed by defendant Gree USA, Inc. with jury demand (Day, Meigs) Modified text on 8/15/2019 (ems).
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER TO STRIKE #25 ; corrected answer due no later than seven days from the date of this order; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
August 14, 2019 Filing 25 (STRICKEN) ANSWER to Amended Complaint, #5 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Gree USA, Inc. (Day, Meigs) Modified text per Order #26 on 8/15/2019 (ems).
August 9, 2019 Filing 24 CORRECTED CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Brief in Support of a Motion #17 filed by Gree Electric Appliances Incorporated of Zhuhai, Gree USA, Inc., Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliances Sales, Limited (Day, Meigs) Modified text on 8/9/2019; this entry replaces #18 (ems).
August 9, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE to attorney Meigs M. Day regarding recent filing #18 (ems)
August 9, 2019 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliances Sales, Limited (Day, Meigs) Modified text on 8/9/2019 (ems).
August 9, 2019 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gree Electric Appliances Incorporated of Zhuhai (Day, Meigs) Modified text on 8/9/2019 (ems).
August 9, 2019 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gree USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Gree Electric Appliances Incorporated of Zhuhai for Gree USA, Inc. (Day, Meigs) Modified text on 8/9/2019 (ems).
August 9, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re FIRST MOTION to quash Improper Service Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(5) #16 filed by Gree Electric Appliances Incorporated of Zhuhai, Gree USA, Inc., Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliances Sales, Limited (Day, Meigs)
August 9, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Brief in Support of a Motion #17 to Quash Service filed by Gree Electric Appliances Incorporated of Zhuhai, Gree USA, Inc., Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliances Sales, Limited (Day, Meigs)
August 9, 2019 Filing 17 BRIEF in support of FIRST MOTION to quash Improper Service Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(5) #16 filed by Gree Electric Appliances Incorporated of Zhuhai, Gree USA, Inc., Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliances Sales, Limited (Day, Meigs)
August 9, 2019 Filing 16 FIRST MOTION to quash Improper Service Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(5) by defendants Gree Electric Appliances Incorporated of Zhuhai, Gree USA, Inc., Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliances Sales, Limited; (Day, Meigs)
August 9, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Meigs M. Day on behalf of defendants Gree Electric Appliances Incorporated of Zhuhai, Gree USA, Inc., Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliances Sales, Limited Limited Appearance (Day, Meigs)
July 29, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS returned executed; Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliances Sales, Limited served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019 (VanBronkhorst, Andrew)
July 29, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS returned executed; (VanBronkhorst, Andrew)
July 26, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS returned executed; Gree Electric Appliances Incorporated of Zhuhai served on 7/5/2019, answer due 7/26/2019 (VanBronkhorst, Andrew)
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS returned executed; (VanBronkhorst, Andrew)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS returned executed; Gree USA, Inc. served on 7/8/2019, answer due 8/16/2019 (VanBronkhorst, Andrew)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting stipulated proposed order #9 ; Defendant Gree USA, Inc. shall have until 8/16/2019 to file responsive pleadings to the first amended complaint; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Extending Time to File Responsive Pleadings by defendant Gree USA, Inc. (Day, Meigs)
July 24, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Meigs M. Day on behalf of defendant Gree USA, Inc. (Day, Meigs)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Gree USA, Inc. (ems)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company of Michigan (VanBronkhorst, Andrew)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Farm Bureau General Insurance Company of Michigan identifying Corporate Parent Michigan Farm Bureau Financial Corporation for Farm Bureau General Insurance Company of Michigan (VanBronkhorst, Andrew)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Farm Bureau General Insurance Company of Michigan, Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company of Michigan (Attachments: #1 Summons) (VanBronkhorst, Andrew) Modified text and filers on 7/1/2019 (ems).
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Gree Electric Appliances Incorporated of Zhuhai, Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliances Sales, Limited (ems)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (ems)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (VanBronkhorst, Andrew)
June 25, 2019 RECEIPT: in the amount of $400.00 by attorney Andrew John VanBronkhorst on behalf of plaintiffs, receipt number 0646-4469475; for filing fee (mkc)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Farm Bureau General Insurance Company of Michigan, Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company of Michigan (VanBronkhorst, Andrew) Modified text and filers on 6/26/2019 (ems).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farm Bureau General Insurance Company of Michigan et al v. Gree USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gree Electric Appliances Incorporated of Zhuhai
Represented By: Meigs M. Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hong Kong Gree Electric Appliances Sales, Limited
Represented By: Meigs M. Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gree USA, Inc.
Represented By: Meigs M. Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company of Michigan
Represented By: Andrew John VanBronkhorst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farm Bureau General Insurance Company of Michigan
Represented By: Andrew John VanBronkhorst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?