Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Coolidge et al
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Joan Coolidge and Tonya Canfield
Case Number: 1:2019cv00552
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed; Joan Coolidge served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019 (Davis, David)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS returned executed; Tonya Canfield served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019 (Davis, David)
August 11, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to complaint #1 by Tonya Canfield (Behan, Michael) Modified text on 8/12/2019 (ns).
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Tonya Canfield, Joan Coolidge (mg)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (mg)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Davis, David)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying MetLife as a corporate parent by plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Davis, David) Modified text on 7/11/2019 (mg).
July 10, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Metropolitan Life Insurance Company in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4480510 (Davis, David)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT in Interpleader against All Defendants filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A-Page 32 of the Certificate of Insurance, #3 Exhibit B-Page 35 of the Summary Plan Description, #4 Exhibit C-6/5/17 Beneficiary Designation, #5 Exhibit D-6/18/15 Beneficiary Designation, #6 Exhibit E-4/18/08 Beneficiary Designation, #7 Exhibit F-Decedent's Death Certificate, #8 Exhibit G-3/17/18 Email from Daiv Walter, #9 Exhibit H-4/3/18 Denial Letter to Daiv Walter, #10 Exhibit I-3/30/18 Claimant's Statement from Tonya Canfield, #11 Exhibit J-Claim Payment Overview List, #12 Exhibit K-9/28/18 Letter from Rebecca Weinberg, LMSW, #13 Exhibit L-9/18/18 Pre-Interpleader Letter from MetLife) (Davis, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Coolidge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: David M. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joan Coolidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonya Canfield
Represented By: Michael R. Behan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?