Carroll v. Bank of America, N.A.
Plaintiff: Geraldine T. Carroll
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00556
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ellen S Carmody
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Copy of Order Cancelling Deadline, #16 sent via U.S. Mail to attorney Jeffrey A. Slocombe (ems)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER terminating Slocombe Law Office, P.C. as counsel of record for Plaintiff; requiring Attorney Slocombe to immediately serve a copy of this Order on Plaintiff and file proof of service; cancelling 9/12/2019 status conference/preliminary injunction hearing and Rule 16 scheduling conference; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
August 29, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE re #5 by defendant Bank of America, N.A. (Magyar, Mark)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: the joint notice, which is due 8/29/2019, should address the current status of Plaintiff's counsel; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 9/12/2019 at 02:30 PM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; joint status report due by 9/5/2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Bank of America, N.A. (Magyar, Mark)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 motion for extension of time; the time for Defendant to file its responsive pleading to Plaintiff's complaint is extended until 8/26/2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting stipulated proposed order #9 ; Dykema Gossett PLLC is substituted in the place and stead of Trott Law PC as counsel for Defendant; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by defendant Bank of America, N.A. (Magyar, Mark)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF in support of MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 #6 filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Magyar, Mark)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 #6 filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Magyar, Mark)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 by defendant Bank of America, N.A.; (Magyar, Mark)
July 26, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Mark John Magyar on behalf of defendant Bank of America, N.A. (Magyar, Mark)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER setting status conference/preliminary injunction hearing for 9/12/2019 at 02:30 PM at 401 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Janet T. Neff; ex parte TRO entered by the state court remains in effect; joint notice due not later than 8/29/2019; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bank of America, N.A. (Kinggo, Robert)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Janet T. Neff ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (clw)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE regarding reassignment of case from Northern Division 2:19-cv-146 to Southern Division per Administrative Order 11-035; all future filings should reflect the NEW CASE NUMBER of 1:19-cv-556 (jlg)
July 15, 2019 RECEIPT: in the amount of $400.00 by Attorney Robert J Kinggo, III on behalf of Defendant, receipt number 0646-4483866; for filing fee (mkc)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 13th Circuit Court case number 19-9172-CH filed by Bank of America, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (Kinggo, Robert) Modified text on 7/16/2019 (jlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carroll v. Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Robert J Kinggo, III
Represented By: Mark John Magyar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldine T. Carroll
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Slocombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?