Strand Constructors, Inc. v. ThyssenKrupp Industrial Solutions (USA), Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Strand Constructors, Inc.
Defendant: Christian Bender, ThyssenKrupp Industrial Solutions (USA), Inc., St. Marys Cement, Inc. and Dennis Lippmann
Case Number: 1:2019cv00569
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER regarding response to Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document) #20 responses due by 9/25/2019; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
September 9, 2019 Filing 20 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER by plaintiff Strand Constructors, Inc. (Vitale, Thomas)
September 3, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Reply to Response to Motion, #18 filed by St. Marys Cement, Inc. (Danek, Brad)
September 3, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to response to motion #11 filed by St. Marys Cement, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A Smith v Glenmark Generics Inc USA, #3 Exhibit B A-M Supply Co v Microsoft Corp, #4 Exhibit C Niemi v American Axle Mfg, #5 Exhibit D New Dimension Development Inc. v Orchard Hiltz, #6 Exhibit E Spartan Distributors Inc v Golf Coast International, #7 Exhibit F Bens Supercenter Inc v All About Contracting & Excavating LLC) (Danek, Brad)
August 21, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE to attorney Thomas John Vitale regarding recent filing #15 (ems)
August 20, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Response in Opposition #15 filed by Strand Constructors, Inc. (Vitale, Thomas)
August 20, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #11 filed by Strand Constructors, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Storey Opinion) (Vitale, Thomas)
July 25, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by St. Marys Cement, Inc. (Danek, Brad)
July 23, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Brief in Support of a Motion, #12 filed by St. Marys Cement, Inc. (Danek, Brad)
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #11 filed by St. Marys Cement, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Discharge of Lien, #4 Exhibit C - Full Unconditional Waiver, #5 Exhibit D - A&M Supply, Niemi, New Dimension, #6 Exhibit E - Affinity, Bens Supercenter) (Danek, Brad)
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by defendant St. Marys Cement, Inc.; (Danek, Brad)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Brief in Support of a Motion, #9 filed by Dennis Lippmann (Nasr, Marcos)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue #8 filed by Dennis Lippmann (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Dennis Lippmann) (Nasr, Marcos)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim , MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue by defendant Dennis Lippmann; (Nasr, Marcos)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Brief in Support of a Motion, #6 filed by ThyssenKrupp Industrial Solutions (USA), Inc. (Nasr, Marcos)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue #5 filed by ThyssenKrupp Industrial Solutions (USA), Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint) (Nasr, Marcos)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim , MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue by defendant ThyssenKrupp Industrial Solutions (USA), Inc.; (Nasr, Marcos)
July 23, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Marcos A. Nasr on behalf of defendants Christian Bender, Dennis Lippmann, ThyssenKrupp Industrial Solutions (USA), Inc. (Nasr, Marcos)
July 23, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Brad A. Danek on behalf of defendant St. Marys Cement, Inc. (Danek, Brad)
July 18, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Krista A. Jackson on behalf of plaintiff Strand Constructors, Inc. (Jackson, Krista)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (mg)
July 17, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Daniel N. Sharkey on behalf of defendant St. Marys Cement, Inc. (Sharkey, Daniel)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 CORRECTED CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ThyssenKrupp Industrial Solutions (USA), Inc. identifying hyssenKrupp North America, Inc. and ThyssenKrupp AG as corporate parents to ThyssenKrupp Industrial Solutions (USA) (Hendrick, Kevin) Modified text on 7/17/2019 (mg).
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ThyssenKrupp Industrial Solutions (USA), Inc. (Hendrick, Kevin) Modified text on 7/16/2019 (jlg)
July 16, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant ThyssenKrupp Industrial Solutions (USA), Inc. in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4484523 (Hendrick, Kevin) Modified text on 7/16/2019 (jlg)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charlevoix County Circuit Court case number 19-0778-26-CK filed by ThyssenKrupp Industrial Solutions (USA), Inc. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Summons to tkIS, #4 Exhibit C - Summons D. Lippmann, #5 Exhibit D - Summons VCNA, #6 Exhibit E - Notice to Circuit Court) (Hendrick, Kevin) Modified text on 7/16/2019 (jlg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strand Constructors, Inc. v. ThyssenKrupp Industrial Solutions (USA), Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Bender
Represented By: Kevin S. Hendrick
Represented By: Marcos A. Nasr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ThyssenKrupp Industrial Solutions (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Kevin S. Hendrick
Represented By: Marcos A. Nasr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Marys Cement, Inc.
Represented By: Brad A. Danek
Represented By: Daniel N. Sharkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Lippmann
Represented By: Kevin S. Hendrick
Represented By: Marcos A. Nasr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strand Constructors, Inc.
Represented By: Krista A. Jackson
Represented By: Thomas John Vitale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?